THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:25:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
C6-110
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3746
Fax: (519) 663-3782
Address: 1055 Fanshawe Park Rd W #201
London Ontario N6A5P6
Phone: (519) 645-0146
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Ontario N9A1E1
Phone: 5199734411
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
London Health Sciences Centre London
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gula Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gula (CPSO#: 71245 )
Business Address: C6 110 - 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3746

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
C6-110
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3746
Fax: (519) 663-3782
Address: 1055 Fanshawe Park Rd W #201
London Ontario N6A5P6
Phone: (519) 645-0146
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Ontario N9A1E1
Phone: 5199734411
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
London Health Sciences Centre London
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gula Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gula (CPSO#: 71245 )
Business Address: C6 110 - 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3746

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORNE JEFFREY GULA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GULA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORNE JEFFREY GULA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GULA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997