THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:07:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 18 Newberry Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 3N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 966-4377
Fax: (613) 966-4730
Address: Quinte Health Care Corporation
Belleville General Site
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: (613) 968-8234

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 11 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Campbell (CPSO#: 71246 )
Business Address: 18 Newberry Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 3N3
(613) 966-4377

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 18 Newberry Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 3N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 966-4377
Fax: (613) 966-4730
Address: Quinte Health Care Corporation
Belleville General Site
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: (613) 968-8234

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 11 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Campbell (CPSO#: 71246 )
Business Address: 18 Newberry Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 3N3
(613) 966-4377

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH ALFRED LESLIE JOHN CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH ALFRED LESLIE JOHN CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997