THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:09:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Hospital
Operating Room
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 742-3611
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-6485
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Katherine Fallon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Fallon (CPSO#: 71276 )
Business Address: Grand River Hosptial
Operating Room
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 742-3611
Business Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 749-6485

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Hospital
Operating Room
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 742-3611
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-6485
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Katherine Fallon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Fallon (CPSO#: 71276 )
Business Address: Grand River Hosptial
Operating Room
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 742-3611
Business Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 749-6485

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHERINE MARY FALLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FALLON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHERINE MARY FALLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FALLON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997