THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:59:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6855 Meadowvale Town Centre Circle
Suite 110
Mississauga Ontario L5N 2Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-858-4292
Fax: 905-858-4291
Address: 255 Elizabeth St E
Listowel Hospital Ambulatory Care Clinic
Listowel ON N4W 2P5
Phone: (519) 292-2080
Fax: (519) 291-1528
Address: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 1Y5
Phone: 905-721-4311
Fax: 905-721-6639

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 18 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Aug 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Haider Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Haider (CPSO#: 71293 )
Business Address: B9 - 1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville Ontario L6H 3P1
(905) 842-8500
Business Address: Listowel Hospital
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel Ontario N4W 2P5
(519) 291-3120
Business Address: 110-6855 Meadowvale Town Centre Cir
Mississauga ON L5N 2Y1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6855 Meadowvale Town Centre Circle
Suite 110
Mississauga Ontario L5N 2Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-858-4292
Fax: 905-858-4291
Address: 255 Elizabeth St E
Listowel Hospital Ambulatory Care Clinic
Listowel ON N4W 2P5
Phone: (519) 292-2080
Fax: (519) 291-1528
Address: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 1Y5
Phone: 905-721-4311
Fax: 905-721-6639

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 18 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Aug 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Haider Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Haider (CPSO#: 71293 )
Business Address: B9 - 1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville Ontario L6H 3P1
(905) 842-8500
Business Address: Listowel Hospital
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel Ontario N4W 2P5
(519) 291-3120
Business Address: 110-6855 Meadowvale Town Centre Cir
Mississauga ON L5N 2Y1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AAMIR HAIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIDER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AAMIR HAIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIDER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997