THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:48:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital Uxbridge
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
LOCATION: Uxbridge

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arcand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Arcand (CPSO#: 71312 )
Business Address: 6472875696

Corporation Name: Arcand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Apr 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital Uxbridge
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
LOCATION: Uxbridge

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arcand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Arcand (CPSO#: 71312 )
Business Address: 6472875696

Corporation Name: Arcand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Apr 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW STEPHEN ARCAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARCAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW STEPHEN ARCAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARCAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997