THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:06:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main St W
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Extension: 73141
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Angelo Mikrogianakis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mikrogianakis (CPSO#: 71314 )
Business Address: McMaster's Children Hospital
HSC 3A - 1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 73141

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main St W
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Extension: 73141
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Angelo Mikrogianakis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mikrogianakis (CPSO#: 71314 )
Business Address: McMaster's Children Hospital
HSC 3A - 1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 73141

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELO MIKROGIANAKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKROGIANAKIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELO MIKROGIANAKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKROGIANAKIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997