THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 07:05:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etherington Hall
Queen's University
Room 2043
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613)-548-1360
Fax: (613) 548-1394

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jocelyn S. Garland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Garland (CPSO#: 71336 )
Business Address: 2043 - 76 Stuart Street
Etherington Hall
Queen's University
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
(613) 533-3207

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etherington Hall
Queen's University
Room 2043
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613)-548-1360
Fax: (613) 548-1394

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jocelyn S. Garland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Garland (CPSO#: 71336 )
Business Address: 2043 - 76 Stuart Street
Etherington Hall
Queen's University
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
(613) 533-3207

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOCELYN SUZANNE GARLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARLAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOCELYN SUZANNE GARLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARLAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997