THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:06:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 219
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 696-0003
Fax: (416) 696-0022
Address: 3535 Ch Queen-Mary
La Clinique Bloom
6e étage
Montréal QC H3V 1H8
Phone: 000-000-0000
Fax: 438-858-2077
Address: Sick Kids Hospital
Division of Pediatric Medicine
Community Pediatrics Section
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 10 May 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carole O'Beirne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. O'Beirne (CPSO#: 71351 )
Business Address: Suite 219
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5T2
(416) 696-0003
Business Address: Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Pediatric Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-1500
Business Address: 3535 Ch Queen-Mary
La Clinique Bloom
6e étage
Montréal QC H3V 1H8
000-000-0000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 219
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 696-0003
Fax: (416) 696-0022
Address: 3535 Ch Queen-Mary
La Clinique Bloom
6e étage
Montréal QC H3V 1H8
Phone: 000-000-0000
Fax: 438-858-2077
Address: Sick Kids Hospital
Division of Pediatric Medicine
Community Pediatrics Section
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 10 May 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carole O'Beirne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. O'Beirne (CPSO#: 71351 )
Business Address: Suite 219
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5T2
(416) 696-0003
Business Address: Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Pediatric Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-1500
Business Address: 3535 Ch Queen-Mary
La Clinique Bloom
6e étage
Montréal QC H3V 1H8
000-000-0000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLE PATRICIA O'BEIRNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BEIRNE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLE PATRICIA O'BEIRNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BEIRNE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997