THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:48:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Albert Street
Waterloo Ontario N2L 3S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 746-1132
Fax: (519) 746-0316

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Shenker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Shenker (CPSO#: 71370 )
Business Address: 50 Albert Street
Waterloo Ontario N2L 3S2
(519) 746-1132

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Albert Street
Waterloo Ontario N2L 3S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 746-1132
Fax: (519) 746-0316

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Shenker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Shenker (CPSO#: 71370 )
Business Address: 50 Albert Street
Waterloo Ontario N2L 3S2
(519) 746-1132

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT LEE SHENKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHENKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT LEE SHENKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHENKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997