THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 10:11:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6175 Highway 7
Unit 20
iHealthCentre
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054972255
Fax: 9054972261
Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital, WOHS
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: 416-747-3400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 20 Lynch St
Brampton ON L6W 2Z8
Phone: 416-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke General Hospital, WOHS
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: 416-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6175 Hwy 7, Units 19-22
Integrated Healthcare Centre, VDMC
Vaughan ON L4H 0P6
Phone: 416-297-8362
Fax: 416-840-8434

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 09 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leonard Tse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Apr 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Tse (CPSO#: 71371 )
Business Address: Unit 105
10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6S 0E2
(905) 497-2255
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 6175 Highway 7
Unit 19-22
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0P6
(905) 850-3091
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: Suite 204
178 John Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2A4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6175 Highway 7
Unit 20
iHealthCentre
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054972255
Fax: 9054972261
Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital, WOHS
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: 416-747-3400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 20 Lynch St
Brampton ON L6W 2Z8
Phone: 416-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke General Hospital, WOHS
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: 416-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6175 Hwy 7, Units 19-22
Integrated Healthcare Centre, VDMC
Vaughan ON L4H 0P6
Phone: 416-297-8362
Fax: 416-840-8434

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 09 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leonard Tse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Apr 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Tse (CPSO#: 71371 )
Business Address: Unit 105
10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6S 0E2
(905) 497-2255
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 6175 Highway 7
Unit 19-22
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0P6
(905) 850-3091
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: Suite 204
178 John Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2A4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEONARD WAYE HAN TSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEONARD WAYE HAN TSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 05 Apr 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2005

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997