THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:35:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 120-2695 North Sheridan Way
CarePoint Health
Mississauga ON L5K 2N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 362-3508
Fax: (905) 670-7040

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Records Storage and Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 416-398-0638 or 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1
Date Received: 18 Sep 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.S. Banwatt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Banwatt (CPSO#: 71374 )
Business Address: 2695 North Sheridan way
Suite 120
Mississauga Ontario L5K 2n9
905-362-3508

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 120-2695 North Sheridan Way
CarePoint Health
Mississauga ON L5K 2N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 362-3508
Fax: (905) 670-7040

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Records Storage and Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 416-398-0638 or 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1
Date Received: 18 Sep 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.S. Banwatt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Banwatt (CPSO#: 71374 )
Business Address: 2695 North Sheridan way
Suite 120
Mississauga Ontario L5K 2n9
905-362-3508

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUNDEEP SINGH BANWATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANWATT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUNDEEP SINGH BANWATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANWATT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997