THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:18:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2250 Bovard Drive East
Suite 617
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 792-6949
Fax: (905) 792-6977

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory Belchetz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Belchetz (CPSO#: 71376 )
Business Address: 2250 Bovaird Drive East
Suite 617
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W3
(905) 792-6949

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2250 Bovard Drive East
Suite 617
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 792-6949
Fax: (905) 792-6977

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory Belchetz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Belchetz (CPSO#: 71376 )
Business Address: 2250 Bovaird Drive East
Suite 617
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W3
(905) 792-6949

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY JON BELCHETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELCHETZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY JON BELCHETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELCHETZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997