THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:52:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
St Joseph's Health Centre
Dept of Surgery
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-530-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gina A. Defreitas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Defreitas (CPSO#: 71383 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000
Business Address: Suite 201
2221 Keele Street
Toronto Ontario M6M 3Z5
(416) 630-9984
Business Address: 60 Kennedy Ave
Toronto ON M6S 2X5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
St Joseph's Health Centre
Dept of Surgery
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-530-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gina A. Defreitas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Defreitas (CPSO#: 71383 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000
Business Address: Suite 201
2221 Keele Street
Toronto Ontario M6M 3Z5
(416) 630-9984
Business Address: 60 Kennedy Ave
Toronto ON M6S 2X5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GINA ANGELA DEFREITAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEFREITAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GINA ANGELA DEFREITAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEFREITAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997