THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:48:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Family Physicians
101-377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 471-9999
Fax: (905) 471-3627

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Filosa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Filosa (CPSO#: 71384 )
Business Address: Markham Family Physicians
Suite 101
377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
(905) 471-9999

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Family Physicians
101-377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 471-9999
Fax: (905) 471-3627

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Filosa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Filosa (CPSO#: 71384 )
Business Address: Markham Family Physicians
Suite 101
377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
(905) 471-9999

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS MICHAEL FILOSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FILOSA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS MICHAEL FILOSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FILOSA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997