THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:49:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1221 Bloor Street East
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 2N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 625-1241
Fax: (905) 625-9514

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wayne Lau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Lau (CPSO#: 71393 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: 1221 Bloor Street East
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 2N8
(905) 625-1241

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1221 Bloor Street East
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 2N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 625-1241
Fax: (905) 625-9514

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wayne Lau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Lau (CPSO#: 71393 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: 1221 Bloor Street East
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 2N8
(905) 625-1241

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WAYNE CHUNG-WAI LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WAYNE CHUNG-WAI LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997