THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:34:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Parkwood OSI Clinic
GTA Site
Suite 1401
5000 Yonge St
Toronto Ontario M2N 7E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 981-2243
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Dec 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.Skorzewska Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Skorzewska (CPSO#: 71405 )
Business Address: 1401-5000 Yonge St
North York ON M2N 7E9
1-888-237-6967 Extn: 45868

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Parkwood OSI Clinic
GTA Site
Suite 1401
5000 Yonge St
Toronto Ontario M2N 7E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 981-2243
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Dec 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.Skorzewska Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Skorzewska (CPSO#: 71405 )
Business Address: 1401-5000 Yonge St
North York ON M2N 7E9
1-888-237-6967 Extn: 45868

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA KRYSTINA SKORZEWSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKORZEWSKA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA KRYSTINA SKORZEWSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKORZEWSKA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997