THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:32:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 95 Homewood Ave\
Wellesley St. James Town Health Centre
Toronto ON M4Y 2K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fung and Ghavamrassoul Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ghavamrassoul (CPSO#: 71419 ) Dr. R. Fung (CPSO#: 76480 )
Business Address: 5th Floor
500 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
(416) 978-1914
Business Address: St Jamestown Health Centre
1st Floor
410 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1K2
(416) 864-3096
Business Address: K302 - 650 Sammon Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5M5
(416) 915-5460
Business Address: 101-95 Homewood Ave
Wellesley-St. James Town Health Centre
Toronto ON M4Y 2K1
416-864-3096

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 95 Homewood Ave\
Wellesley St. James Town Health Centre
Toronto ON M4Y 2K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fung and Ghavamrassoul Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ghavamrassoul (CPSO#: 71419 ) Dr. R. Fung (CPSO#: 76480 )
Business Address: 5th Floor
500 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
(416) 978-1914
Business Address: St Jamestown Health Centre
1st Floor
410 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1K2
(416) 864-3096
Business Address: K302 - 650 Sammon Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5M5
(416) 915-5460
Business Address: 101-95 Homewood Ave
Wellesley-St. James Town Health Centre
Toronto ON M4Y 2K1
416-864-3096

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABBAS GHAVAMRASSOUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHAVAMRASSOUL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABBAS GHAVAMRASSOUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHAVAMRASSOUL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997