THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:38:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital-LHSC
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6C 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8379
Fax: (519) 685-8049

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 10 May 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joanne Grimmer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Grimmer (CPSO#: 71420 )
Business Address: Children's Hospital - LHSC
800 Commissioners Road East
Room B1-168
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8379

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital-LHSC
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6C 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8379
Fax: (519) 685-8049

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 10 May 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joanne Grimmer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Grimmer (CPSO#: 71420 )
Business Address: Children's Hospital - LHSC
800 Commissioners Road East
Room B1-168
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8379

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNE GRIMMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIMMER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNE GRIMMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIMMER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 May 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997