THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:25:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: Fink, Nicole Christina (Used Until: 30 Nov 1998)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Hospital
Department of Surgery Offices
Unit B-3
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 575-6365
Fax: (905) 381-7071

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicole C. Hodgson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hodgson (CPSO#: 71422 )
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital
Department of Surgery Offices
Unit B-3
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 575-6365

General Information

Former Name: Fink, Nicole Christina (Used Until: 30 Nov 1998)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Hospital
Department of Surgery Offices
Unit B-3
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 575-6365
Fax: (905) 381-7071

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicole C. Hodgson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hodgson (CPSO#: 71422 )
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital
Department of Surgery Offices
Unit B-3
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 575-6365

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE CHRISTINA HODGSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HODGSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE CHRISTINA HODGSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HODGSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997