THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 08:11:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centre For Healthy Aging
St Peters Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 777-3837
Extension: 74132
Fax: (905) 526-2062

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 13 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Misiaszek & King Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. C. King (CPSO#: 70164 ) Dr. B. Misiaszek (CPSO#: 71425 )
Business Address: Centre for Healthy Aging
St Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1W9
(905) 777-3837
Business Address: Suite 105
17 King Street East
Dundas Ontario L9H 1B7
(905) 628-5656

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centre For Healthy Aging
St Peters Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 777-3837
Extension: 74132
Fax: (905) 526-2062

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 13 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Misiaszek & King Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. C. King (CPSO#: 70164 ) Dr. B. Misiaszek (CPSO#: 71425 )
Business Address: Centre for Healthy Aging
St Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1W9
(905) 777-3837
Business Address: Suite 105
17 King Street East
Dundas Ontario L9H 1B7
(905) 628-5656

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN CHRISTOPHER MISIASZEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MISIASZEK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN CHRISTOPHER MISIASZEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MISIASZEK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997