THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:14:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel H. Kim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kim (CPSO#: 71432 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 900-0380

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel H. Kim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kim (CPSO#: 71432 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 900-0380

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL HWAN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL HWAN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2013
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 15 Aug 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997