THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:13:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Golden Plough Lodge
983 Burnham St.
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 372-8759
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 297 Division St.
Cobourg Ontario K9A 3R2
Phone: 905-377-9925
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 60 Swayne St.
Cobourg Ontario K9A 1K5
Phone: 905-372-2245
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.B. Reynolds Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Nov 2022

Corporation Name: Teresa Reynolds Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Jul 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Golden Plough Lodge
983 Burnham St.
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 372-8759
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 297 Division St.
Cobourg Ontario K9A 3R2
Phone: 905-377-9925
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 60 Swayne St.
Cobourg Ontario K9A 1K5
Phone: 905-372-2245
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.B. Reynolds Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Nov 2022

Corporation Name: Teresa Reynolds Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Jul 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TERESA BETH REYNOLDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REYNOLDS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TERESA BETH REYNOLDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REYNOLDS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997