THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:32:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 118 Hatt St
Dundas Ontario L9H 2G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 627-4975
Fax: (905) 627-7553

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dalia Eino Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Eino (CPSO#: 71448 )
Business Address: 118 Hatt St Unit 1
Dundas On L9H2G6
9056274975
Business Address: 215 King Street West
Dundas Ontario L9H 1V6
(905) 627-4975

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 118 Hatt St
Dundas Ontario L9H 2G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 627-4975
Fax: (905) 627-7553

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dalia Eino Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Eino (CPSO#: 71448 )
Business Address: 118 Hatt St Unit 1
Dundas On L9H2G6
9056274975
Business Address: 215 King Street West
Dundas Ontario L9H 1V6
(905) 627-4975

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DALIA MAHMOUD EINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EINO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DALIA MAHMOUD EINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EINO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997