THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:02:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queen's University Etherington Hall
Room 1008
94 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 533 2056
Fax: 613 533 6654

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Murphy Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wilson (CPSO#: 72644 ) Dr. J. Murphy (CPSO#: 71473 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-3232
Business Address: Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
(613) 345-5645
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: Queen's University Etherington Hall
94 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queen's University Etherington Hall
Room 1008
94 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 533 2056
Fax: 613 533 6654

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Murphy Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wilson (CPSO#: 72644 ) Dr. J. Murphy (CPSO#: 71473 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-3232
Business Address: Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
(613) 345-5645
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: Queen's University Etherington Hall
94 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHANNA MARGARET MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHANNA MARGARET MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 12 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2003

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997