THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:36:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Park St
Box 1059
Sundridge ON P0A 1Z0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 384-1277
Fax: (705) 384-1279

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah J. MacKinnon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. MacKinnon (CPSO#: 71478 )
Business Address: Box 1059
5 Park Street
Sundridge Ontario P0A 1Z0
(705) 384-1277

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Park St
Box 1059
Sundridge ON P0A 1Z0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 384-1277
Fax: (705) 384-1279

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah J. MacKinnon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. MacKinnon (CPSO#: 71478 )
Business Address: Box 1059
5 Park Street
Sundridge Ontario P0A 1Z0
(705) 384-1277

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH JANINE MACKINNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKINNON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH JANINE MACKINNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKINNON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997