THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:44:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M1 102 Head and Neck Surgery
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-5104
Fax: (416) 480-5761

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Higgins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Higgins (CPSO#: 71488 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M1 102
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-5104

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M1 102 Head and Neck Surgery
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-5104
Fax: (416) 480-5761

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Higgins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Higgins (CPSO#: 71488 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M1 102
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-5104

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN MCLOUGHLIN HIGGINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIGGINS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN MCLOUGHLIN HIGGINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIGGINS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Mar 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997