THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 18:07:10 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1315 Finch Avenue West
Suite 111
Toronto Ontario M3J 2G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 631-6888
Fax: (416) 631-6887
Address: A-3549 Bathurst St
North York ON M6A 2C7
Phone: 4167801100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: suite 201-225 Richmond Street West
Toronto Ontario M5V 1W2
Phone: 416631XXXX
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Francine Gerstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Gerstein (CPSO#: 71489 )
Business Address: CMH Medical Centre
1315 Finch Avenue West
Suite 111
North York Ontario M3J 2G6
(416) 631-6888
Business Address: 3549 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M6A 2C7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1315 Finch Avenue West
Suite 111
Toronto Ontario M3J 2G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 631-6888
Fax: (416) 631-6887
Address: A-3549 Bathurst St
North York ON M6A 2C7
Phone: 4167801100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: suite 201-225 Richmond Street West
Toronto Ontario M5V 1W2
Phone: 416631XXXX
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Francine Gerstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Gerstein (CPSO#: 71489 )
Business Address: CMH Medical Centre
1315 Finch Avenue West
Suite 111
North York Ontario M3J 2G6
(416) 631-6888
Business Address: 3549 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M6A 2C7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCINE HYNDA GERSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERSTEIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCINE HYNDA GERSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997