THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:36:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
15th Floor Cardinal Carter Wing
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Extension: 2395
Fax: (416) 864-6073

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Freire-Lizama Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Freire-Lizama (CPSO#: 71512 )
Business Address: Women's Health Centre
4th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
(416) 867-7484
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
15th Floor Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-6060 Extn: 2395

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
15th Floor Cardinal Carter Wing
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Extension: 2395
Fax: (416) 864-6073

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Freire-Lizama Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Freire-Lizama (CPSO#: 71512 )
Business Address: Women's Health Centre
4th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
(416) 867-7484
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
15th Floor Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-6060 Extn: 2395

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TATIANA FREIRE-LIZAMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREIRE-LIZAMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TATIANA FREIRE-LIZAMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREIRE-LIZAMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997