THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:33:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 505 - 3030 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-0767
Fax: (416) 800-2508

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Debra Butt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Butt (CPSO#: 71515 )
Business Address: Scarborough General Medical Mall
Suite 505
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 284-0767

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 505 - 3030 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-0767
Fax: (416) 800-2508

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Debra Butt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Butt (CPSO#: 71515 )
Business Address: Scarborough General Medical Mall
Suite 505
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 284-0767

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBRA ANN BUTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBRA ANN BUTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997