THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:35:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 425
1200 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-7080
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
P O Box 1800
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: humber river hospital
1235 wilson ave
Toronto Ontario M3M0B2
Phone: 416-242-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Jacobson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Jacobson (CPSO#: 71517 )
Business Address: 425 - 1200 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 3C3
(416) 438-7080
Business Address: Humber River Regional Hospital
P O Box 1800
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7000
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 243-4191

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 425
1200 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-7080
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
P O Box 1800
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: humber river hospital
1235 wilson ave
Toronto Ontario M3M0B2
Phone: 416-242-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Jacobson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Jacobson (CPSO#: 71517 )
Business Address: 425 - 1200 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 3C3
(416) 438-7080
Business Address: Humber River Regional Hospital
P O Box 1800
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7000
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 243-4191

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL DAVID MORRIS JACOBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACOBSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL DAVID MORRIS JACOBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACOBSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1997
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1997