THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:33:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 804 John Marks Ave
Kingston Ontario K7K 0J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 507-7003
Fax: (613) 507-7006

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Nowak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nowak (CPSO#: 71536 )
Business Address: 804 John Marks Avenue
804 John Marks Ave
Kingston Ontario K7K 0J7
6135077003

Corporation Name: J. Nowak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 804 John Marks Ave
Kingston Ontario K7K 0J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 507-7003
Fax: (613) 507-7006

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Nowak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nowak (CPSO#: 71536 )
Business Address: 804 John Marks Avenue
804 John Marks Ave
Kingston Ontario K7K 0J7
6135077003

Corporation Name: J. Nowak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTYNA MARIA MONICA NOWAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOWAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTYNA MARIA MONICA NOWAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOWAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997