THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 17:06:00 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Heath Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: (905) 830-5972

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Silmberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Silmberg (CPSO#: 71544 )
Business Address: 102 - 955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
(289) 553-6336
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: B02 - 250 Harding Boulevard
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
(905) 737-0595
Business Address: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: Units 3, 4 and 5
125 Pedersen Drive
Aurora Ontario L4G 0E3
Business Address: 104 - 679 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
(905) 895-1313

Corporation Name: Partap Law Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Heath Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: (905) 830-5972

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Silmberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Silmberg (CPSO#: 71544 )
Business Address: 102 - 955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
(289) 553-6336
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: B02 - 250 Harding Boulevard
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
(905) 737-0595
Business Address: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: Units 3, 4 and 5
125 Pedersen Drive
Aurora Ontario L4G 0E3
Business Address: 104 - 679 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
(905) 895-1313

Corporation Name: Partap Law Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIK OLAV SILMBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILMBERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIK OLAV SILMBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILMBERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997