THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:50:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: Broom, Hilarie Louise (Used Until: 02 Nov 2003)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Extension: 58175
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Peel Memorial Centre
20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: 905-494-2120
Extension: 34567
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: 9054942120
Extension: 58175
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hilarie Sheehan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sheehan (CPSO#: 71548 )
Business Address: B10 - 40 Fingate Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6T 3J1
(905) 792-8440
Business Address: 103 - 10425 Kennedy Road North
Brampton Ontario L6Z 0A4
(905) 846-7733
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(905) 494-2120 Extn: 58175
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120 Extn: 58175
Business Address: Peel Memorial Centre
20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
(905) 494-2120 Extn: 34567

General Information

Former Name: Broom, Hilarie Louise (Used Until: 02 Nov 2003)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Extension: 58175
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Peel Memorial Centre
20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: 905-494-2120
Extension: 34567
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: 9054942120
Extension: 58175
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hilarie Sheehan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sheehan (CPSO#: 71548 )
Business Address: B10 - 40 Fingate Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6T 3J1
(905) 792-8440
Business Address: 103 - 10425 Kennedy Road North
Brampton Ontario L6Z 0A4
(905) 846-7733
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(905) 494-2120 Extn: 58175
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120 Extn: 58175
Business Address: Peel Memorial Centre
20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
(905) 494-2120 Extn: 34567

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HILARIE LOUISE SHEEHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEEHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HILARIE LOUISE SHEEHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEEHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997