THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:10:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 31
1495 Cornwall Road
Oakville Ontario L6J 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 901-9545
Fax: (905) 901-9643
Address: 520 Locust Street
Burlington Ontario L7S 1V2
Phone: 905 634-5573
Fax: 905 634-5406

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. de Kleer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. N. de Kleer (CPSO#: 71579 )
Business Address: 520 Locust Street
Burlington Ontario L7S 1V2
Business Address: Suite 31
1495 Cornwall Road
Oakville Ontario L6J 0B2
(905) 901-9545

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 31
1495 Cornwall Road
Oakville Ontario L6J 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 901-9545
Fax: (905) 901-9643
Address: 520 Locust Street
Burlington Ontario L7S 1V2
Phone: 905 634-5573
Fax: 905 634-5406

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. de Kleer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. N. de Kleer (CPSO#: 71579 )
Business Address: 520 Locust Street
Burlington Ontario L7S 1V2
Business Address: Suite 31
1495 Cornwall Road
Oakville Ontario L6J 0B2
(905) 901-9545

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NANCY MARY ANN DE KLEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE KLEER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NANCY MARY ANN DE KLEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE KLEER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On July 16, 2012, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Milton, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. de Kleer.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On July 16, 2012, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Milton, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. de Kleer.

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997