THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:28:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Geriatric Psychiatry Community
Services of Ottawa
Room 131 Y
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 562-0283
Fax: (613) 562-0259
Address: 2225 Mer-Bleue Rd
Aline- Chrétien Health Hub
Geriatric Psychiatry
Community Services of Ottawa
Orléans Ontario K4A 5M3
Phone: 613-562-0283
Fax: 613-562-0259
Address: Sisters of Charity Health Services
43 Bruyere
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 562-6262
Fax: (613) 562-0259

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 12 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Louise Carrier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Carrier (CPSO#: 71586 )
Business Address: 43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
(613) 562-6262
Business Address: 131Y - 75 Bruyere Street
Geriatric Psychiatry Community Services of Ottawa
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C7
(613) 562-0283
Business Address: 2225 Mer-Bleue Road
Ottawa Ontario K4A 3T8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Geriatric Psychiatry Community
Services of Ottawa
Room 131 Y
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 562-0283
Fax: (613) 562-0259
Address: 2225 Mer-Bleue Rd
Aline- Chrétien Health Hub
Geriatric Psychiatry
Community Services of Ottawa
Orléans Ontario K4A 5M3
Phone: 613-562-0283
Fax: 613-562-0259
Address: Sisters of Charity Health Services
43 Bruyere
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 562-6262
Fax: (613) 562-0259

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 12 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Louise Carrier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Carrier (CPSO#: 71586 )
Business Address: 43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
(613) 562-6262
Business Address: 131Y - 75 Bruyere Street
Geriatric Psychiatry Community Services of Ottawa
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C7
(613) 562-0283
Business Address: 2225 Mer-Bleue Road
Ottawa Ontario K4A 3T8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOUISE CARRIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARRIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOUISE CARRIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARRIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1997