THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 07:25:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Psychiatry
Sunnybrook HSC
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4073
Fax: (416) 480-6878

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amy Heung Yu Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cheung (CPSO#: 71591 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4073

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Psychiatry
Sunnybrook HSC
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4073
Fax: (416) 480-6878

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amy Heung Yu Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cheung (CPSO#: 71591 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4073

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMY HEUNG YU CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMY HEUNG YU CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997