THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:52:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Univ of Ottawa Heart Institute
Division of Cardiology
40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 696-7332
Fax: (613) 696-7128

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 11 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Derek So Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shiau (CPSO#: 70057 ) Dr. D. So (CPSO#: 71596 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Univ of Ottawa Heart Institute
Division of Cardiology
40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 696-7332
Fax: (613) 696-7128

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 11 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Derek So Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shiau (CPSO#: 70057 ) Dr. D. So (CPSO#: 71596 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEREK YIU FAI SO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEREK YIU FAI SO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997