THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:20:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 85 The East Mall
Etobicoke Ontario M8Z 5W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 621-2220
Fax: (416) 621-2203
Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: 519-751-5544
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 21 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sean R. Bulley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bulley (CPSO#: 71598 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
5197515544
Business Address: 85 The East Mall
Etobicoke ON M8Z 5W4
4166212220

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 85 The East Mall
Etobicoke Ontario M8Z 5W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 621-2220
Fax: (416) 621-2203
Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: 519-751-5544
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 21 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sean R. Bulley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bulley (CPSO#: 71598 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
5197515544
Business Address: 85 The East Mall
Etobicoke ON M8Z 5W4
4166212220

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEAN ROBERT BULLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BULLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEAN ROBERT BULLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BULLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997