THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 04:50:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 145 Front St E
City Health Associates
Toronto ON M5A 1E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shobana Ananth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ananth (CPSO#: 71608 )
Business Address: Markham-Stouffville Hospital
Department Of Emergency Medicine
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 145 Front St E
City Health Associates
Toronto ON M5A 1E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shobana Ananth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ananth (CPSO#: 71608 )
Business Address: Markham-Stouffville Hospital
Department Of Emergency Medicine
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHOBANA ANANTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANANTH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHOBANA ANANTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANANTH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997