THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:19:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Medical Centre
3rd Floor, Rm 316-318
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-6222
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary Comerford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Comerford (CPSO#: 71613 )
Business Address: The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2X5
(705) 743-6222

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Medical Centre
3rd Floor, Rm 316-318
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-6222
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary Comerford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Comerford (CPSO#: 71613 )
Business Address: The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2X5
(705) 743-6222

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY LOUISE COMERFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMERFORD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY LOUISE COMERFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMERFORD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997