THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:48:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 175 Commerce Valley Drive West
Ontario Addiction Treatment Centres
Markham Ontario L3T 7P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057733884
Fax: 6473403700
Address: OATC Alliston
Lower Level
96 Victoria Street West
Alliston Ontario L9R 1S6
Phone: (705) 250-5100
Fax: (705) 434-4555
Address: OATC Keswick
204 Simcoe Ave., Units 1 & 2
Keswick, ON
Keswick Ontario L4P 3S6
Phone: (905) 476-3737
Fax: (905) 476-9826
Address: OATC London
45 Wharncliffe Road South
London Ontario N6J 2M6
Phone: (519) 204-8430
Fax: (519) 204-8403
Address: OATC North Bay
456 Ferguson Street
North Bay Ontario P1B 1X4
Phone: (705) 497-1620
Fax: (705) 497-0552
Address: 45 Bloor Street East Unit 2, Oshawa
Oshawa Ontario L1H3L9
Phone: 905-443-0223
Fax: 905-443-0225
Address: 215 Sherbrooke Street, Peterborough
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2N2
Phone: 705-748-0995
Fax: 705-748-5946
Address: OATC Thunder Bay North
119 Cumberland Street North
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 4M3
Phone: (807) 768-2910
Fax: (807) 768-2880
Address: OATC Thunder Bay Westfort
218 Frederica Street West
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 3W2
Phone: (807) 577-3540
Fax: (807) 577-3675
Address: OATC Thunder Bay South
421 Victoria Avenue East
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 1A6
Phone: (807) 622-2900
Fax: (807) 622-2969
Address: 6 - 843 Red River Road, Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 1K3
Phone: 807-768-4352
Fax: 807-768-4375
Address: 201 - 225 Richmond Street West
Maple Telemedicine
Toronto Ontario M5V 1W2
Phone: 647-497-7453
Fax: 647-340-4700

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: DocuDavit Solutions
28 Eugene Street
Toronto, ON
M6B 3Z4

Tel: (416) 781-9083 or (888) 781-9083
Date Received: 23 Jan 2008

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dalia Rosen-Zaidener Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rosen-Zaidener (CPSO#: 71634 )
Business Address: OATC Bancroft
89 Hastings Street North
Bancroft Ontario K0L 1C0
(613) 332-0660
Business Address: 401 Somerset Street West
Ottawa Ontario K2P 0K1
Business Address: OATC Thunder Bay North
119 Cumberland Street North
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 4M3
(807) 768-2910
Business Address: Units 1 & 2
204 Simcoe Avenue
Keswick Ontario L4P 3S6
Business Address: 211 Highland Street
Haliburton Ontario K0M 1S0
(705) 455-9900
Business Address: 215 Sherbrooke Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2N2
Business Address: 257 Front Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 3Z6
(613) 969-7862
Business Address: 45 Bloor Street East
Unit 2
Oshawa Ontario L1H 3L9
Business Address: OATC London
45 Wharncliffe Road South
London Ontario N6J 2M6
(519) 204-8430
Business Address: OATC North Bay
456 Ferguson Street
North Bay Ontario P1B 1X4
(705) 497-1620
Business Address: 214 Main Street
P O Box 776
Atikokan Ontario P0T 1C0
(807) 597-1515
Business Address: Manulife Post Office
P O Box 19569
Toronto Ontario M4W 3T9
(905) 773-3884
Business Address: 6-843 Red River Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 1K3
(807) 768-4352
Business Address: OATC Alliston
Lower Level
96 Victoria Street West
Alliston Ontario L9R 1S6
(705) 812-3822
Business Address: OATC Fort Frances
404 Scott Street
Fort Frances Ontario P9A 1H2
(807) 274-8305
Business Address: Room 373-E
Vidal Street South
Sarnia Ontario N7T 2V3
(519) 491-2109
Business Address: OATC Thunder Bay Westfort
218 Frederica Street West
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 3W2
(807) 577-3540
Business Address: OATC Thunder Bay South
421 Victoria Avenue East
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 1A6
(807) 622-2900

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 175 Commerce Valley Drive West
Ontario Addiction Treatment Centres
Markham Ontario L3T 7P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057733884
Fax: 6473403700
Address: OATC Alliston
Lower Level
96 Victoria Street West
Alliston Ontario L9R 1S6
Phone: (705) 250-5100
Fax: (705) 434-4555
Address: OATC Keswick
204 Simcoe Ave., Units 1 & 2
Keswick, ON
Keswick Ontario L4P 3S6
Phone: (905) 476-3737
Fax: (905) 476-9826
Address: OATC London
45 Wharncliffe Road South
London Ontario N6J 2M6
Phone: (519) 204-8430
Fax: (519) 204-8403
Address: OATC North Bay
456 Ferguson Street
North Bay Ontario P1B 1X4
Phone: (705) 497-1620
Fax: (705) 497-0552
Address: 45 Bloor Street East Unit 2, Oshawa
Oshawa Ontario L1H3L9
Phone: 905-443-0223
Fax: 905-443-0225
Address: 215 Sherbrooke Street, Peterborough
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2N2
Phone: 705-748-0995
Fax: 705-748-5946
Address: OATC Thunder Bay North
119 Cumberland Street North
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 4M3
Phone: (807) 768-2910
Fax: (807) 768-2880
Address: OATC Thunder Bay Westfort
218 Frederica Street West
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 3W2
Phone: (807) 577-3540
Fax: (807) 577-3675
Address: OATC Thunder Bay South
421 Victoria Avenue East
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 1A6
Phone: (807) 622-2900
Fax: (807) 622-2969
Address: 6 - 843 Red River Road, Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 1K3
Phone: 807-768-4352
Fax: 807-768-4375
Address: 201 - 225 Richmond Street West
Maple Telemedicine
Toronto Ontario M5V 1W2
Phone: 647-497-7453
Fax: 647-340-4700

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: DocuDavit Solutions
28 Eugene Street
Toronto, ON
M6B 3Z4

Tel: (416) 781-9083 or (888) 781-9083
Date Received: 23 Jan 2008

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dalia Rosen-Zaidener Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rosen-Zaidener (CPSO#: 71634 )
Business Address: OATC Bancroft
89 Hastings Street North
Bancroft Ontario K0L 1C0
(613) 332-0660
Business Address: 401 Somerset Street West
Ottawa Ontario K2P 0K1
Business Address: OATC Thunder Bay North
119 Cumberland Street North
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 4M3
(807) 768-2910
Business Address: Units 1 & 2
204 Simcoe Avenue
Keswick Ontario L4P 3S6
Business Address: 211 Highland Street
Haliburton Ontario K0M 1S0
(705) 455-9900
Business Address: 215 Sherbrooke Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2N2
Business Address: 257 Front Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 3Z6
(613) 969-7862
Business Address: 45 Bloor Street East
Unit 2
Oshawa Ontario L1H 3L9
Business Address: OATC London
45 Wharncliffe Road South
London Ontario N6J 2M6
(519) 204-8430
Business Address: OATC North Bay
456 Ferguson Street
North Bay Ontario P1B 1X4
(705) 497-1620
Business Address: 214 Main Street
P O Box 776
Atikokan Ontario P0T 1C0
(807) 597-1515
Business Address: Manulife Post Office
P O Box 19569
Toronto Ontario M4W 3T9
(905) 773-3884
Business Address: 6-843 Red River Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 1K3
(807) 768-4352
Business Address: OATC Alliston
Lower Level
96 Victoria Street West
Alliston Ontario L9R 1S6
(705) 812-3822
Business Address: OATC Fort Frances
404 Scott Street
Fort Frances Ontario P9A 1H2
(807) 274-8305
Business Address: Room 373-E
Vidal Street South
Sarnia Ontario N7T 2V3
(519) 491-2109
Business Address: OATC Thunder Bay Westfort
218 Frederica Street West
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 3W2
(807) 577-3540
Business Address: OATC Thunder Bay South
421 Victoria Avenue East
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 1A6
(807) 622-2900

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DALIA SHARON ROSEN-ZAIDENER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSEN-ZAIDENER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DALIA SHARON ROSEN-ZAIDENER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSEN-ZAIDENER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997