THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:33:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 210 Centrum Blvd
Suit 101
Orléans Ontario K1E 3V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 837-5454
Fax: (613) 837-3781
Address: 770 Broadview Ave
Ottawa Ontario K2A 3Z3
Phone: 613-729-9463
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aneta Dauksza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dauksza (CPSO#: 71646 )
Business Address: 210 Centrum Blvd
Orléans ON K1E 3V7
613-837-5454
Business Address: Unit H
876 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L3
(613) 742-8182

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 210 Centrum Blvd
Suit 101
Orléans Ontario K1E 3V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 837-5454
Fax: (613) 837-3781
Address: 770 Broadview Ave
Ottawa Ontario K2A 3Z3
Phone: 613-729-9463
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aneta Dauksza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dauksza (CPSO#: 71646 )
Business Address: 210 Centrum Blvd
Orléans ON K1E 3V7
613-837-5454
Business Address: Unit H
876 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L3
(613) 742-8182

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANETA JANINA DAUKSZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAUKSZA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANETA JANINA DAUKSZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAUKSZA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997