THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:56:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 122
4190 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1S 4T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 293-8800
Fax: (416) 293-8803

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K.H. Yuen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Yuen (CPSO#: 71660 )
Business Address: Suite 122
4190 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1S 4T7
(416) 293-8800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 122
4190 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1S 4T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 293-8800
Fax: (416) 293-8803

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K.H. Yuen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Yuen (CPSO#: 71660 )
Business Address: Suite 122
4190 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1S 4T7
(416) 293-8800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENG HONG PETER YUEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENG HONG PETER YUEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997