THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:17:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1081 Carling Avenue
Suite 700
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 1V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 563-3670
Fax: (613) 563-4124
Address: Suite 108
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2G 5X2
Phone: 613 627 0795
Fax: 613 226 7059
Address: Suite 104
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K2G 5X2
Phone: 613 691 2578
Fax: 613 226 7059

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Millar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Millar (CPSO#: 71692 )
Business Address: Suite 108
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2G 5X2
(613) 627-0795
Business Address: 104 - 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
(613) 691-2578
Business Address: 700 - 1071 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1S 5K4
(613) 563-3670

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1081 Carling Avenue
Suite 700
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 1V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 563-3670
Fax: (613) 563-4124
Address: Suite 108
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2G 5X2
Phone: 613 627 0795
Fax: 613 226 7059
Address: Suite 104
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K2G 5X2
Phone: 613 691 2578
Fax: 613 226 7059

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Millar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Millar (CPSO#: 71692 )
Business Address: Suite 108
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2G 5X2
(613) 627-0795
Business Address: 104 - 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
(613) 691-2578
Business Address: 700 - 1071 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1S 5K4
(613) 563-3670

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ROSS MILLAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ROSS MILLAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997