THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:00:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-240 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 647-6100
Fax: (705) 647-0173

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jean M. Corbin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Corbin (CPSO#: 71694 )
Business Address: 240 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
(705) 647-6100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-240 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 647-6100
Fax: (705) 647-0173

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jean M. Corbin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Corbin (CPSO#: 71694 )
Business Address: 240 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
(705) 647-6100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN MARC CORBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORBIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN MARC CORBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORBIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jan 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2000

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2000

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 1999
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997