THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:49:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Southampton, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Ctre
Dept of Critical Care Medicine
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 1708
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 10 Aug 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Anesthesiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 10 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martin Chapman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chapman (CPSO#: 71701 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Southampton, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Ctre
Dept of Critical Care Medicine
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 1708
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 10 Aug 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Anesthesiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 10 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martin Chapman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chapman (CPSO#: 71701 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTIN GILES CHAPMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAPMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTIN GILES CHAPMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAPMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Southampton, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 May 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 May 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2007

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 May 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 May 2001
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 May 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997