THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:31:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 430 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury Ontario P3C 5K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 671-9797
Fax: (705) 671-2992

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Guy Mongeon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Mongeon (CPSO#: 71719 )
Business Address: 430 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury Ontario P3C 5K7
(705) 671-9797

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 430 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury Ontario P3C 5K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 671-9797
Fax: (705) 671-2992

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Guy Mongeon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Mongeon (CPSO#: 71719 )
Business Address: 430 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury Ontario P3C 5K7
(705) 671-9797

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GUY JEAN-PIERRE MONGEON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONGEON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GUY JEAN-PIERRE MONGEON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONGEON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997