THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:16:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical and Pharmaceutical University, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2086 Lawrence Avenue West
Suite 3
Toronto Ontario M9N 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 240-0777
Fax: (416) 240-7228

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jul 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 21 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ngoc Khong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Khong (CPSO#: 71733 )
Business Address: 2086 Lawrence Avenue West
Suite 3
Toronto Ontario M9N 3Z9
(416) 240-0777

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE
Medical School: Medical and Pharmaceutical University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2086 Lawrence Avenue West
Suite 3
Toronto Ontario M9N 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 240-0777
Fax: (416) 240-7228

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jul 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 21 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ngoc Khong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Khong (CPSO#: 71733 )
Business Address: 2086 Lawrence Avenue West
Suite 3
Toronto Ontario M9N 3Z9
(416) 240-0777

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NGOC THI BICH KHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NGOC THI BICH KHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical and Pharmaceutical University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997