THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:04:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: One Kids Place
400 McKeown Ave.
North Bay Ontario P1B 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 495-8115
Fax: (705) 495-8114

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Grise Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Grise (CPSO#: 71734 )
Business Address: 400 McKeown Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 0B2

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Grise Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Jul 2024

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Grise Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Jun 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: One Kids Place
400 McKeown Ave.
North Bay Ontario P1B 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 495-8115
Fax: (705) 495-8114

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Grise Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Grise (CPSO#: 71734 )
Business Address: 400 McKeown Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 0B2

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Grise Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Jul 2024

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Grise Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Jun 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY ELEANOR GRISE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRISE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY ELEANOR GRISE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRISE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997