THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:00:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Surgery
HHS - General Site
237 Barton Street East
6North Room 614
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-0271
Extension: 44736
Fax: 905-523-5889

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Libya

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Faidi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Faidi (CPSO#: 71753 )
Business Address: Department of Surgery
HHS - General Site
237 Barton Street
6North Room614
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 44736

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Surgery
HHS - General Site
237 Barton Street East
6North Room 614
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-0271
Extension: 44736
Fax: 905-523-5889

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Libya

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Faidi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Faidi (CPSO#: 71753 )
Business Address: Department of Surgery
HHS - General Site
237 Barton Street
6North Room614
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 44736

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMIR ABDELMAGID FAIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAIDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMIR ABDELMAGID FAIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAIDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997